US HB831 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-57. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reviving America's Scenic Byways Act of 2019 Reviving America's Scenic Byways Act of 2019 This bill requires the Department of Transportation to issue a request for nominations with respect to roads to be designated under the national scenic byways program and make publicly available a list specifying the roads designated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reviving America's Scenic Byways Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 66 (Y: 404 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-22SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-57. (TXT | PDF)
2019-09-22SenateSigned by President.
2019-09-11SenatePresented to President.
2019-09-10SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-09-09SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
2019-09-09SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5367)
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2019-02-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 19 (Roll no. 66). (text: CR H1373)
2019-02-06HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1377)
2019-02-06HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-02-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 831.
2019-02-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1372-1374)
2019-02-06HouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB349 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Held at the desk.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback