US HB826 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands programs to address neglected tropical diseases (NTDs), which are infections caused by pathogens, including viruses, microbes, and helminths (parasitic worms), that disproportionately impact individuals living in extreme poverty, especially in developing countries. Examples include dengue, leprosy, and rabies. The bill sets forth certain priorities for the NTDs Program of the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID), including the coordination of program activities with other USAID development sectors regarding (1) education; (2) food security; and (3) water, sanitation, and hygiene. The bill also directs the Department of State and the President to encourage foreign governments and international entities (e.g., the World Bank Institute) to address NTDs. Additionally, the Department of Health and Human Services must take a series of actions relating to NTDs, including promoting initiatives in international forums and establishing a panel to address worm infections. The Centers for Disease Control and Prevention may award grants to support centers of excellence for research, training, and treatment regarding NTDs, including Ebola.
Title
End Neglected Tropical Diseases Act
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3460 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2481 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2481 (Related) 2019-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Africa
Argentina
Asia
Brazil
Child health
China
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug therapy
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mexico
Middle East
Multilateral development programs
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Nutrition and diet
Pest management
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Saudi Arabia
South Africa
South Korea
United Nations
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's health
World health
Africa
Argentina
Asia
Brazil
Child health
China
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug therapy
Food assistance and relief
Foreign aid and international relief
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mexico
Middle East
Multilateral development programs
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Nutrition and diet
Pest management
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Saudi Arabia
South Africa
South Korea
United Nations
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's health
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/826/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr826/BILLS-116hr826ih.pdf |