US HB8255 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies and confirms the actions of the Department of the Interior to take into trust approximately 17 acres of land in Cleveland County, North Carolina, for the benefit of the Catawba Indian Nation. The land is made part of the Catawba Reservation. The bill allows gaming on the land taken into trust for the tribe.
Title
Catawba Indian Nation Lands Act
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB790 (Related) 2020-12-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 607.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Native Americans
North Carolina
South Carolina
Gambling
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Native Americans
North Carolina
South Carolina
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8255/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8255/BILLS-116hr8255ih.pdf |