US HB817 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits federal funds from being used to: (1) transfer any individual detained by the United States at Naval Station Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, to any military installation or federal detention center in Georgia; or (2) house any such individual at a Georgia installation or detention center.
Title
To prohibit the use of funds to transfer individuals detained at Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, to facilities in Georgia or to house such individuals at such facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Nathan Deal [R-GA] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] |
Rep. John Linder [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-03 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB829 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1073 (Related) 2009-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1186 (Related) 2009-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1566 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1638 (Related) 2009-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB2315 (Related) 2009-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1073 (Related) 2009-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1186 (Related) 2009-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1566 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1638 (Related) 2009-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB2315 (Related) 2009-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Cuba
Detention of persons
Georgia
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Cuba
Detention of persons
Georgia
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/817/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr817/BILLS-111hr817ih.pdf |