US HB8076 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the mass cancellation of student loans.
Title
Student Loan Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. John Rose [R-TN] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8006 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4253 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8102 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8496 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4253 (Related) 2022-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8102 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8496 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/8076/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr8076/BILLS-117hr8076ih.pdf |