US HB801 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Route 66 National Historic Trail Designation Act This bill amends the National Trails System Act to designate a trail of approximately 2,400 miles extending from Chicago, Illinois, to Santa Monica, California, as the Route 66 National Historic Trail. The trail shall be administered by the National Park Service in a manner that respects and maintains its idiosyncratic nature.
Title
Route 66 National Historic Trail Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-06-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4754-4755) |
2018-06-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 801. |
2018-06-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4754-4758) |
2018-06-05 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 484. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-633. |
2018-01-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-10 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-11-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3609 (Related) 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways