US HB7930 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to protect more victims of domestic violence by preventing their abusers from possessing or receiving firearms, and for other purposes.
Title
Lori Jackson Domestic Violence Survivor Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-08-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4443 (Same As) 2020-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
SB4443 (Same As) 2020-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Firearms and explosives
Retail and wholesale trades
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Firearms and explosives
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7930/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7930/BILLS-116hr7930ih.pdf |