US HB786 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ACHE Act Appalachian Communities Health Emergency Act This bill requires the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences to conduct or support studies on the health impacts of mountaintop removal coal mining on individuals in the surrounding communities. The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), upon receiving the results of these studies, must determine whether such mining presents any health risks to individuals in those communities. This bill applies to surface coal mining that uses blasting with explosives in the steep slope regions of Kentucky, Tennessee, West Virginia, and Virginia. The bill prohibits authorization for any mountaintop removal coal mining project or expansion under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) or the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 unless HHS determines that such mining does not present any health risk to individuals in the surrounding communities. The bill requires monitoring of air, water, and soil for pollution, including noise pollution, until HHS makes its determination. HHS must publish pollution monitoring results. The Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement of the Department of the Interior must assess a one-time fee upon such mining projects, sufficient to cover the federal cost of the studies and pollution monitoring required by this bill.
Title
ACHE Act Appalachian Communities Health Emergency Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Air quality
Coal
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Kentucky
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Mining
Noise pollution
Research administration and funding
Tennessee
User charges and fees
Virginia
Water quality
West Virginia
Coal
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Kentucky
Licensing and registrations
Medical research
Mining
Noise pollution
Research administration and funding
Tennessee
User charges and fees
Virginia
Water quality
West Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/786/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr786/BILLS-115hr786ih.pdf |