US HB783 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2011 - Extends federal recognition to the following Indian tribes of Virginia and establishes their relationship with the federal government as described below: (1) the Chickahominy Tribe, (2) the Chickahominy Indian Tribe--Eastern Division, (3) the Upper Mattaponi Tribe, (4) the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc., (5) the Monacan Indian Nation, and (6) the Nansemond Indian Tribe. Makes the tribes and their members eligible for all services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized Indian tribes. Establishes the service area of each tribe and requirements for each tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body. Requires the Secretary of the Interior, on request of any of the tribes, to take specified lands into trust for the benefit of that tribe, to be considered part of that tribe's reservation. Prohibits the tribes from conducting gaming activities. Prohibits this Act from affecting the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, or water rights of the tribes and their members. Requires Virginia to exercise jurisdiction over all criminal offenses committed, and all civil actions arising, on lands in Virginia owned by, or held in trust by the United States for, the tribes. Authorizes the Secretary to accept all or any portion of Virginia's jurisdiction over such offenses and actions on verification by the Secretary of a tribe's certification that the tribe possesses the capacity to reassume such jurisdiction. Prohibits the use of eminent domain to acquire lands in fee or in trust for an Indian tribe recognized under this Act.
Title
Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2011-02-18 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E285) |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB379 (Related) 2012-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491.
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Native Americans
Property rights
State and local government operations
Virginia
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Native Americans
Property rights
State and local government operations
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/783/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr783/BILLS-112hr783ih.pdf |