US HB7776 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Boulder Canyon Project Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to expend amounts in the Colorado River Dam fund, and for other purposes.
Title
Help Hoover Dam Act
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-06-12 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged |
2024-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4016 (Same As) 2024-09-11 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7776/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7776/BILLS-118hr7776ih.pdf |