US HB775 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Access to Rehabilitation Services Act of 2015 Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to repeal the caps on Medicare outpatient rehabilitation physical therapy services and speech-language pathology services.
Title
Medicare Access to Rehabilitation Services Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB539 (Related) 2015-02-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1076-1077; text of measure as introduced: CR S1077)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/775/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr775/BILLS-114hr775ih.pdf |