US HB7708 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require MA organizations offering network-based plans to maintain an accurate provider directory, and for other purposes.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to require MA organizations offering network-based plans to maintain an accurate provider directory, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2024-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3430 (Related) 2023-12-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 265.
SB3059 (Related) 2023-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3059 (Related) 2023-10-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7708/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7708/BILLS-118hr7708ih.pdf |