US HB7672 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individuals to file claims and receive compensation for harm or death suffered as a result of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). A Special Master appointed by the Department of Justice must review claims submitted and determine if a claimant is eligible for compensation, the extent of the harm to the claimant, and the amount of compensation to be awarded.
Title
Coronavirus Victims Compensation Fund Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-07-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6909 (Related) 2020-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7628 (Related) 2020-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3755 (Related) 2020-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7628 (Related) 2020-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3755 (Related) 2020-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Cemeteries and funerals
Department of Justice
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Law
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Administrative remedies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Cemeteries and funerals
Department of Justice
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Law
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7672/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7672/BILLS-116hr7672ih.pdf |