US HB759 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama-Coushatta Indian Tribes of Texas Restoration Act, which restores the federal trust relationship between the United States and the tribe, to prohibit the Act from being construed to preclude or limit the applicability of the Indian Gaming Regulatory Act.
Title
Ysleta del Sur Pueblo and Alabama-Coushatta Tribes of Texas Equal and Fair Opportunity Settlement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7361) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 759. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7361-7364) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 125. |
2019-07-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-165. |
2019-06-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-19 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |