US HB754 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Anwar Sadat Centennial Celebration Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the posthumous award of a Congressional Gold Medal to Anwar Sadat in recognition of his achievements and heroic actions to attain comprehensive peace in the Middle East. Such medal shall be presented to: (1) the widow of Anwar Sadat, Jehan Sadat, or her next of kin; and (2) a representative of the government of Egypt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anwar Sadat Centennial Celebration Act

Sponsors

Rep. Chris Stewart [R]Rep. Grace Meng [D]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R]Rep. Eliot Engel [D]
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D]Rep. Steve Cohen [D]Rep. John Delaney [D]
Rep. Paul Gosar [R]Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R]Rep. Trent Franks [R]Rep. Kay Granger [R]
Rep. Darrell Issa [R]Rep. Nita Lowey [D]Rep. Adam Smith [D]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D]
Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Mike Coffman [R]Rep. Jim Banks [R]Rep. Keith Ellison [D]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D]Rep. Paul Cook [R]Rep. Ted Lieu [D]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D]Rep. Brad Sherman [D]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]Rep. Peter King [R]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R]Rep. Brian Mast [R]
Rep. Ron DeSantis [R]Rep. Bobby Rush [D]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D]Rep. Charlie Crist [D]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Frank Pallone [D]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]
Rep. Don Beyer [D]Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D]Rep. Mark Pocan [D]
Rep. Danny Davis [D]Rep. Jack Bergman [R]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]
Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D]Rep. Andre Carson [D]Rep. Susan Brooks [R]
Rep. David Young [R]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D]Rep. Randy Hultgren [R]Rep. Michael Simpson [R]
Rep. David Joyce [R]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. Steve Russell [R]Rep. John Lewis [D]
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R]Rep. Mark Meadows [R]Rep. Tom Rice [R]Rep. John Faso [R]
Rep. Don Bacon [R]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D]Rep. Judy Chu [D]Rep. Henry Johnson [D]
Rep. Susan Davis [D]Rep. Joseph Crowley [D]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]Rep. Rodney Davis [R]
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D]Rep. Michael Conaway [R]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R]Rep. Andy Harris [R]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R]Rep. John Carter [R]Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]
Rep. Edward Royce [R]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]Rep. Devin Nunes [R]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D]
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D]Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Mia Love [R]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D]Rep. French Hill [R]Rep. Albio Sires [D]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]
Rep. Jose Serrano [D]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]Rep. Darren Soto [D]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D]
Rep. Marc Veasey [D]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D]Rep. James McGovern [D]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D]Rep. Timothy Walz [D]Rep. Dwight Evans [D]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Dina Titus [D]
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D]Rep. David Price [D]Rep. Rick Allen [R]
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R]Rep. Ann Wagner [R]Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Rep. Steve Chabot [R]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D]Rep. David Cicilline [D]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D]Rep. Sander Levin [D]Rep. Michael McCaul [R]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]
Rep. Peter Welch [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]Rep. Kevin Cramer [R]Rep. John Conyers [D]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]Rep. Roger Williams [R]Rep. Robert Pittenger [R]
Rep. Donald Norcross [D]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R]Rep. Bill Posey [R]Rep. Bill Foster [D]
Rep. Alma Adams [D]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. John Larson [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]
Rep. David Scott [D]Rep. Luke Messer [R]Rep. Steve King [R]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]
Rep. Jim Costa [D]Rep. Robert Scott [D]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D]Rep. Blake Farenthold [R]
Rep. Keith Rothfus [R]Rep. Luis Correa [D]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R]
Rep. Todd Rokita [R]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R]Rep. Val Demings [D]Rep. Steve Scalise [R]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D]Rep. Ruben Kihuen [D]Rep. Dennis Ross [R]Rep. Christopher Smith [R]
Rep. David Kustoff [R]Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R]Rep. Scott Perry [R]Rep. Ted Budd [R]
Rep. Andy Biggs [R]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Ben Lujan [D]
Rep. Clay Higgins [R]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D]Rep. Brian Babin [R]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]Rep. Peter Roskam [R]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]
Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. John Curtis [R]Rep. Lacy Clay [D]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]
Rep. Paul Mitchell [R]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D]Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. Richard Nolan [D]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D]Rep. Leonard Lance [R]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D]Rep. Ralph Norman [R]
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]Rep. Brian Higgins [D]Rep. Ron Kind [D]
Rep. Bill Shuster [R]Rep. Steve Womack [R]Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. James Langevin [D]
Rep. Jim Jordan [R]Rep. Al Green [D]Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]Rep. Robin Kelly [D]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R]Rep. Lou Barletta [R]Rep. John Sarbanes [D]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [D]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]Rep. Diane Black [R]Rep. Scott Taylor [R]
Rep. Karen Bass [D]Rep. Tom Marino [R]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D]Rep. Mark Takano [D]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I]Rep. Jim Cooper [D]
Rep. Tom McClintock [R]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D]Rep. Al Lawson [D]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D]
Rep. Jared Huffman [D]Rep. Mike Bost [R]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R]Rep. Dave Brat [R]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D]Rep. Maxine Waters [D]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R]
Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. John Moolenaar [R]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]Rep. Jeff Denham [R]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D]Rep. Darin LaHood [R]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D]
Rep. David Rouzer [R]Rep. Richard Neal [D]Rep. Evan Jenkins [R]Rep. Michael Capuano [D]
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R]Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. James Himes [D]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D]Rep. David Roe [R]Rep. Niki Tsongas [D]
Rep. David Loebsack [D]Rep. Tim Ryan [D]Rep. Michael Burgess [R]Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D]Rep. Tim Walberg [R]Rep. Lamar Smith [R]Rep. Bill Johnson [R]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R]Rep. Bill Flores [R]Rep. David McKinley [R]Rep. Mike Bishop [R]
Rep. Mark Walker [R]Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. Mark Amodei [R]Rep. Eric Crawford [R]
Rep. John Culberson [R]Rep. Tom Cole [R]Rep. Trey Gowdy [R]Rep. Roger Marshall [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenatePresented to President.
2018-12-06SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-12-04SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7278)
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 585.
2018-09-26HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-26HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9068-9069)
2018-09-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 754.
2018-09-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9068-9070)
2018-09-26HouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-01-31HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2017-01-31HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB266 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback