US HB752 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Administrative Conference of the United States to create and maintain a database of specified information about fees awarded in certain court cases and adversarial administrative proceedings in which the United States is a party.
Title
Open Book on Equal Access to Justice Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-02-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1413) |
2019-02-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 752. |
2019-02-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1413-1415) |
2019-02-07 | House | Mr. Cohen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB217 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government liability
Law
Legal fees and court costs
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government liability
Law
Legal fees and court costs