US HB7514 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 345 South Main Street in Butler, Pennsylvania, as the "Andrew Gomer Williams Post Office Building".
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 345 South Main Street in Butler, Pennsylvania, as the "Andrew Gomer Williams Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. John Joyce [R-PA] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-304. |
2022-12-27 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7282-7283) |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2022-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9671) |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7514. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: H9671-9672) |
2022-12-12 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-05-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-04-14 | House | Introduced in House |