US HB7496 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to install a plaque at the peak of Ram Head in the Virgin Islands National Park on St. John, United States Virgin Islands, to commemorate the slave rebellion that began on St. John in 1733.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to install a plaque at the peak of Ram Head in the Virgin Islands National Park on St. John, United States Virgin Islands, to commemorate the slave rebellion that began on St. John in 1733.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9682) |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7496. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9682-9683) |
2022-12-12 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 438. |
2022-12-07 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-605. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-07-13 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2022-06-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2022-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-11 | House | Introduced in House |