US HB7340 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires federal agencies to develop and disclose reopening plans that incorporate certain information before sending employees back to work during a public health emergency, such as the emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, the bill requires an agency to post a reopening plan on its website at least 30 days before reopening a facility. Among other information, the plan must detail (1) the personal protective equipment (PPE) that the agency will provide to its employees; (2) protections for employees whose work requires them to be in nonfederal buildings, such as auditors; and (3) potential measures to reverse the reopening that still ensure the continuity of operations. Each agency's Office of the Inspector General must report on whether the agency has complied with this bill's requirements and whether the agency has provided adequate PPE for its employees.
Title
Chai Suthammanont Remembrance Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-09-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5073-5074) |
2020-09-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7340. |
2020-09-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5073-5075) |
2020-09-30 | House | Mr. Connolly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4766 (Related) 2020-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Worker safety and health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Worker safety and health