US HB7321 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 49, United States Code, to require certain air carriers to provide reports with respect to maintenance, preventive maintenance, or alterations, and for other purposes.
Title
Global Aircraft Maintenance Safety Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 374 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2022-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 52 (Roll no. 467). (text: CR H8162-8163) |
2022-09-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8275-8276) |
2022-09-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-09-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7321. |
2022-09-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8162-8164) |
2022-09-28 | House | Mr. Kahele moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 381. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-506. |
2022-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 49 - 5. |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2022-03-31 | House | Introduced in House |