US HB732 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Access to Speedy Review Act Requires the Board of Veterans' Appeals, for purposes of scheduling a veteran's appeal hearing at the earliest possible date, to determine whether to provide such hearing: (1) at its principal location or at another Department of Veterans Affairs facility or other federal facility, and (2) through the use of videoconferencing or by an appellant's personal appearance. Requires the Board to notify the appellant of such decisions. Allows the appellant to request a different location or type of hearing. Requires the Board to grant such request and ensure that the hearing is scheduled at the earliest possible date.
Title
Veterans Access to Speedy Review Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Mark Takai [D-HI] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2015-05-14 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB677 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability assistance
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/732/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr732/BILLS-114hr732ih.pdf |