US HB7279 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Infrastructure Improvement Act (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to allow municipalities to develop a plan that integrates wastewater and stormwater management. A permit for a municipal discharge under the national pollutant discharge elimination system that incorporates an integrated plan may integrate all requirements under the Act addressed in the plan, such as requirements relating to combined sewer overflows, sanitary sewer collection systems, and total maximum daily loads. A plan that is incorporated into a permit may include the implementation of green infrastructure and projects to reclaim, recycle, or reuse water. Green infrastructure includes measures that mimic natural processes to store, reuse, or reduce stormwater. Those permits may include a schedule of compliance that allows actions for meeting water quality-based effluent limitations to be implemented over more than one permit term if the compliance schedules are authorized by state water quality standards. A municipality under an administrative order or settlement agreement may request a modification of the order or settlement based on the municipality's integrated plan. The EPA must report on each integrated plan developed and implemented through a permit, order, or judicial consent decree since June 5, 2012, including a description of the control measures, levels of control, estimated costs, and compliance schedules for the requirements implemented through such a plan. (Sec. 4) The bill establishes an Office of the Municipal Ombudsman in the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to provide: (1) technical assistance to municipalities seeking to comply with the Clean Water Act, and (2) information to the EPA to ensure that agency policies are implemented by all EPA offices. (Sec. 5) The EPA must promote the use of green infrastructure.
Title
Water Infrastructure Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-19 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 441 (Y: 351 N: 10 NV: 71 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8036) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2018-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 351 - 10 (Roll no. 441). (text: CR H10288-10289) |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10317) |
2018-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Massie objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2018-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7279. |
2018-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10288-10291) |
2018-12-19 | House | Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2018-12-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2018-12-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1971 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2355 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB692 (Related) 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB2355 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
SB692 (Related) 2017-10-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Licensing and registrations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water storage
Water use and supply