US HB7224 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Training Program.
Title
To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the Stop, Observe, Ask, and Respond to Health and Wellness Training Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 431. |
2024-05-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-519. |
2024-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 45 - 0. |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-03-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 0. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-02-05 | House | Introduced in House |