US HB722 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a specified mountain near Elk Ridge City in Utah as Miracle Mountain.
Title
Miracle Mountain Designation Act
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 687 (Y: 410 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 410 - 0 (Roll no. 687). (text: 12/16/2019 CR H10300) |
2019-12-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10315-10316) |
2019-12-16 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 722. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10300-10301) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-12-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1870 (Related) 2020-09-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Fires
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Fires
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats