US HB7167 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-20 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-20 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restoring the Public Trust Act
Title
Restoring the Public Trust Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-11-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-11-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-11-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB305 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Ms. Eshoo. Petition No: 115-1. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB567 (Related) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB3876 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB4014 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB5019 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5182 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB6788 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB26 (Related) 2017-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB567 (Related) 2017-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB3876 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB4014 (Related) 2017-10-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB5019 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5182 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB6788 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB26 (Related) 2017-01-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Family relationships
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial review and appeals
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protection of officials
Public contracts and procurement
Russia
Subversive activities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Family relationships
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Judicial review and appeals
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protection of officials
Public contracts and procurement
Russia
Subversive activities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/7167/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr7167/BILLS-115hr7167ih.pdf |