US HB7132 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-223.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-07 - Became Public Law No: 117-223.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To preserve safe access to communications services for survivors of domestic violence and other crimes, and for other purposes.
Title
Safe Connections Act of 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-223. |
2022-12-07 | House | Signed by President. |
2022-12-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2022-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6770) |
2022-07-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2022-07-27 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1254, and the motion offered by Mr. Kildee, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 623, as amended; H.R. 3952, as amended; H.R. 3962, as amended; H.R. 4551; H.R. 5313, as amended; H.R. 6933; H.R. 7132, as amended; H.R. 7361; H.R. 7569; H.R. 7624, as amended; H.R. 7733, as amended; and H.R. 7981, as amended. (consideration: CR H7197-7211, H7219-7220, H7223-7237; text: 07/26/2022 CR H7103-7105) |
2022-07-27 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1254, proceedings on H.R. 7132 are considered vacated. |
2022-07-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7132. |
2022-07-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7103-7106) |
2022-07-26 | House | Mr. Doyle, Michael F. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 342. |
2022-07-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-438. |
2022-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 0. |
2022-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-06-15 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 0 . |
2022-06-15 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB120 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Held at the desk.
HR1254 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1254 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.