US HB709 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 52-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prevent Targeting at the IRS Act Amends the Internal Revenue Service Restructuring and Reform Act of 1998 to expand existing grounds for termination of the employment of an Internal Revenue Service employee to include performing, delaying, or failing to perform (or threatening to perform, delay, or fail to perform) any official action (including any audit) with respect to a taxpayer for purpose of extracting personal gain or benefit or for a political purpose.
Title
Prevent Targeting at the IRS Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-04-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2238) |
2015-04-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 709. |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2238-2240) |
2015-04-15 | House | Mr. Ryan (WI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 46. |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-66. |
2015-03-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB941 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1578 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
SB1578 (Related) 2015-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Department of the Treasury
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Employee performance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation