US HB7085 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-2)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the defense of qualified immunity in civil actions for deprivation of rights. Qualified immunity is a judicially created doctrine that protects government employees or those acting with state authority from being held personally liable for constitutional violations. The bill provides that under the statute allowing a civil action alleging deprivation of rights under color of law, it shall not be a defense or immunity to any such action that (1) the defendant was acting in good faith or believed that his or her conduct was lawful at the time it was committed; (2) the rights, privileges, or immunities secured by the Constitution or laws were not clearly established at the time of their deprivation; or (3) the state of the law was such that the defendant could not reasonably have been expected to know whether his or her conduct was lawful.
Title
Ending Qualified Immunity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-06-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4036 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4142 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8979 (Related) 2020-12-16 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4142 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8979 (Related) 2020-12-16 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Due process and equal protection
Government liability
Law enforcement officers
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Due process and equal protection
Government liability
Law enforcement officers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7085/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7085/BILLS-116hr7085ih.pdf |