US HB7046 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Labor to modify the implementation of the adverse effect wage rate for H-2A nonimmigrants.
Title
Supporting Farm Operations Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Lisa McClain [R-MI] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
Rep. Russell Fry [R-SC] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Laurel Lee [R-FL] | Rep. Cliff Bentz [R-OR] |
Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Hillary Scholten [D-MI] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3308 (Related) 2023-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB874 (Related) 2023-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3848 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB874 (Related) 2023-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3848 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/7046/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr7046/BILLS-118hr7046ih.pdf |