US HB6976 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to provide that aliens who have been convicted of or who have committed an offense for driving while intoxicated or impaired are inadmissible and deportable.
Title
Protect Our Communities from DUIs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - House - On Passage RC# 31 (Y: 274 N: 150 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2024-02-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-02-01 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 274 - 150 (Roll no. 31). (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H369) |
2024-02-01 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2024-02-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 6976. |
2024-02-01 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5585, H.R. 6678, H.R. 6679 and H.R. 6976. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5585, H.R. 6678, H.R. 6679, and H.R. 6976 under a structured rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each measure. |
2024-02-01 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 980. (consideration: CR H369-373) |
2024-01-30 | House | Rule H. Res. 980 passed House. |
2024-01-29 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 980 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5585, H.R. 6678, H.R. 6679 and H.R. 6976. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5585, H.R. 6678, H.R. 6679, and H.R. 6976 under a structured rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each measure. |
2024-01-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 292. |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 118-357. |
2024-01-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 10. |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR980 (Related) 2024-01-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3833 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7959 (Related) 2024-04-11 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3833 (Related) 2024-02-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7959 (Related) 2024-04-11 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.