US HB697 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Homeland Security Clearance Management and Administration Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require that the designation of the sensitivity level of national security positions be conducted in a consistent manner in all Department of Homeland Security (DHS) components and offices, consistent with federal guidelines. DHS must use uniform designation tools throughout DHS and provide training to appropriate staff. The bill requires DHS: (1) by July 6, 2017, and every five years thereafter, to review all sensitivity level designations of national security positions at DHS; (2) if it determines that a change in the sensitivity level is warranted, to administratively adjust access and complete an appropriate level periodic reinvestigation; and (3) to report on such positions requiring access to classified information, no longer requiring access, or requiring a different level of access. DHS's Inspector General must conduct regular audits of DHS compliance with regulations regarding such designations. DHS must submit an annual report, through FY2022, on the denials, suspensions, revocations, and appeals of an individual's eligibility for access to classified information in DHS. DHS must: (1) develop a plan to achieve greater uniformity regarding the adjudication of eligibility of an individual for access to classified information that is consistent with the Adjudicative Guidelines for Determining Access to Classified Information, and (2) ensure that all information received for such adjudication is consistent with such Guidelines and is protected against misappropriation. The plan shall consider the establishment of an internal appeals panel responsible for final national security clearance denial and revocation determinations.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Clearance Management and Administration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-01-31 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-31 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H776-777) |
2017-01-31 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 697. |
2017-01-31 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H776-778) |
2017-01-31 | House | Mr. King (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information