US HB689 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bolts Ditch Access and Use Act (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Agriculture to permit by special use authorization nonmotorized access and use of the Bolts Ditch headgate and the Bolts Ditch within the Holy Cross Wilderness in Colorado for the diversion of water and use, maintenance, and repair of the ditch and headgate by the town of Minturn, Colorado.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bolts Ditch Access and Use Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 409 N: 1 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 71.
2017-05-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-58.
2017-03-30SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2017-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2017-02-06HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-02-06HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 1 (Roll no. 79). (text: CR H984)
2017-02-06HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H993)
2017-02-06HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-02-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 689.
2017-02-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H984-985)
2017-02-06HouseMr. Lamborn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-01-24HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB285 (Same As) 2017-05-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 66.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback