US HB689 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 111-206.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Became Public Law No: 111-206.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to Senate on March 2, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Shasta-Trinity National Forest Administrative Jurisdiction Transfer Act - Transfers the administrative jurisdiction of specified federal land in the Shasta-Trinity National Forest in California from the Secretary of Agriculture to the Secretary of the Interior. Transfers the administrative jurisdiction of specified federal land in California administered by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) from the Secretary of the Interior to the Secretary of Agriculture. Withdraws such land from the public domain and reserves it for administration as part of the Shasta-Trinity National Forest. Prohibits the land transferred to the Secretary of Agriculture that is in the Trinity Alps Wilderness from affecting the wilderness status of that land. Requires the Secretaries, with respect to the transferred lands, to identify any known sites concerning hazardous substances and to provide notice of any such sites to the head of the federal agency to which the land is being transferred. States that the Secretaries shall remain responsible for any cleanup of hazardous substances on the federal land which was under their administrative jurisdiction. Prohibits anything in this Act from affecting any valid existing right, withdrawal, right-of-way, easement, lease, license, or permit.
Title
Shasta-Trinity National Forest Administrative Jurisdiction Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Became Public Law No: 111-206. | |
2010-07-27 | Signed by President. | |
2010-07-19 | Presented to President. | |
2010-07-13 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-07-13 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-07-13 | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5514-5515) | |
2010-07-13 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 689. | |
2010-07-13 | Ms. Bordallo moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5514-5515) | |
2010-05-07 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-05-07 | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3429-3431; text as passed Senate: CR S5431) | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 295. | |
2010-03-02 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-145. | |
2009-12-16 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | |
2009-10-29 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. | |
2009-06-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-06-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6022-6023) | |
2009-06-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 689. | |
2009-06-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6022-6023) | |
2009-06-02 | Mrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 52. | |
2009-05-14 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-108. | |
2009-04-29 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-04-29 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-04-29 | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. | |
2009-03-24 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2009-01-26 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E138) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1328 (Related) 2009-10-29 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Forests. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-223.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
California
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Forests
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
California
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Forests
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources