US HB6870 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-277.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To rename the Stop Trading on Congressional Knowledge Act of 2012 in honor of Representative Louise McIntosh Slaughter. (Sec. 1) This bill changes the title of the Stop Trading on Congressional Knowledge Act of 2012 to the "Representative Louise McIntosh Slaughter Stop Trading on Congressional Knowledge Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To rename the Stop Trading on Congressional Knowledge Act of 2012 in honor of Representative Louise McIntosh Slaughter.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-03SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-277.
2018-11-03SenateSigned by President.
2018-10-24SenatePresented to President.
2018-10-24SenatePresented to President.
2018-10-12SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-10-11SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2018-10-11SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6879-6880)
2018-10-01SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2018-09-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-28HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9357)
2018-09-28HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9357)
2018-09-28HouseMr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Agriculture discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
2018-09-28HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
2018-09-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Agriculture, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Agriculture, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Agriculture, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Agriculture, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Agriculture, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4504 (Related) 2017-11-30 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Rules, House Administration, the Judiciary, Ethics, Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback