US HB686 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Mergers, Acquisitions, Sales, and Brokerage Simplification Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to exempt from its registration requirements certain merger and acquisition brokers and associated persons. A merger and acquisition broker shall not be exempt from registration, however, if the broker: (1) receives, holds, transmits, or has custody of any funds or securities to be exchanged by parties to a transfer of ownership of an eligible privately held company; or (2) engages on behalf of an issuer in a public offering of securities that are either subject to mandatory registration, or with respect to which the issuer must file periodic information, documents, and reports. Nothing in this Act shall be construed to limit any other authority of the Securities and Exchange Commission to exempt any person, or any class of persons, from any provision of this Act, including any related rule or regulation.
Title
Small Business Mergers, Acquisitions, Sales, and Brokerage Simplification Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. David Jolly [R-FL] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 303. |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-400. |
2015-05-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 24. |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-29 | House | Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral. |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB37 (Related) 2015-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1010 (Related) 2015-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1675 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1010 (Related) 2015-04-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1675 (Related) 2016-02-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Licensing and registrations
Securities
Small business
Business records
Corporate finance and management
Finance and financial sector
Licensing and registrations
Securities
Small business