US HB686 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on July 20, 2011. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Utah National Guard Readiness Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior, through the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) to convey to the state of Utah, without consideration, certain lands located within the boundaries of the public lands currently withdrawn for military use by the Utah National Guard and known as "Camp Williams" for the purpose of permitting the Utah National Guard to use such conveyed land. Provides for the supersedence of a specified Executive Order only insofar as it affects the lands identified for conveyance. Reverts conveyed lands to the United States if the Secretary of Defense (DOD) determines that the land, or any part of such land, is sold or attempted to be sold, or that it or any part is used for non-National Guard or non-national defense purposes. Requires the state, with respect to any part of the land conveyed that the Secretary of Defense determines is subject to reversion, if such Secretary determines that the part contains hazardous materials, to pay the United States the fair market value of that part of the conveyed land. Bars the application of the reversionary interest to that part of the land.
Title
Utah National Guard Readiness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] |
Roll Calls
2011-10-03 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 400 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2011-10-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-10-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 0 (Roll no. 742). (text: CR H6470) |
2011-10-03 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6485-6486) |
2011-10-03 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-10-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 686. |
2011-10-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6470-6471) |
2011-10-03 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-07-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108. |
2011-07-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-163. |
2011-06-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-06-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-06-15 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. |
2011-05-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
National Guard and reserves
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
National Guard and reserves
Public lands and natural resources
Utah