US HB6852 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 4 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-04 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To designate Holcombe Rucker Park, in Harlem, New York, as a National Commemorative Site, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holcombe Rucker Park National Commemorative Site Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-04HouseSigned by President.
2024-12-27HousePresented to President.
2024-12-23SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2024-12-20SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7287-7288)
2024-12-20SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2024-09-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2024-09-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2024-09-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5723-5724)
2024-09-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6852.
2024-09-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5723-5725)
2024-09-24HouseMr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2024-09-12HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 568.
2024-09-12HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-672.
2024-05-07HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent.
2024-05-07HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
2024-05-07HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged
2024-03-07HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held
2024-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2023-12-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-12-19HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback