US HB685 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the community-based outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Bend, Oregon, as the "Robert Maxwell VA Clinic."
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Bend, Oregon, as the "Robert Maxwell VA Clinic".
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7379 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB4072 (Related) 2020-10-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-169. (TXT | PDF)
SB4072 (Related) 2020-10-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-169. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Oregon
Veterans' medical care
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Oregon
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/685/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr685/BILLS-116hr685ih.pdf |