US HB685 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
United States Civil Rights Trail Special Resource Study Act of 2009 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study to evaluate a range of alternatives for the protection and interpretation of sites associated with the struggle for civil rights in the United States, including alternatives for potential addition of some or all of the sites to the National Trails System. Requires submission of a report to Congress that contains the results of such study and recommendations of the Secretary respecting the route.
Title
United States Civil Rights Trail Special Resource Study Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] |
Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Carolyn Kilpatrick [D-MI] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Mark Souder [R-IN] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Zach Wamp [R-TN] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
Rep. Diane Watson [D-CA] | Rep. Melvin Watt [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608. | |
2010-09-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-322. | |
2010-07-21 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-05-19 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. | |
2009-09-30 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-09-29 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-29 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-09-29 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10003) | |
2009-09-29 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 685. | |
2009-09-29 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10003-10004) | |
2009-09-29 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-09-29 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 148. | |
2009-09-29 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-267. | |
2009-09-10 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-09-10 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-09-10 | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. | |
2009-07-08 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1802 (Related) 2010-05-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 111-645.
Subjects
Government investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Racial and ethnic relations