US HB684 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-26-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marketplace Fairness Act of 2013 - Authorizes each member state under the Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement (the multistate agreement for the administration and collection of sales and use taxes adopted on November 12, 2002) to require all sellers not qualifying for a small-seller exception (applicable to sellers with annual gross receipts in total U.S. remote sales not exceeding $1 million) to collect and remit sales and use taxes with respect to remote sales under provisions of the Agreement, but only if such Agreement includes minimum simplification requirements relating to the administration of the tax, audits, and streamlined filing. Defines "remote sale" as a sale of goods or services into a state in which the seller would not legally be required to pay, collect, or remit state or local sales and use taxes unless provided by this Act.
Title
Marketplace Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB336 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB743 (Same As) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB2609 (Related) 2014-11-12 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S5902)
SB743 (Same As) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
SB2609 (Related) 2014-11-12 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S5902)
Subjects
Internet and video services
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/684/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr684/BILLS-113hr684ih.pdf |