US HB68 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tiffany Joslyn Juvenile Accountability Block Grant Program Reauthorization Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to revise and reauthorize for FY2020 the Juvenile Accountability Block Grant (JABG) Program. It subjects JABG grants to accountability measures. The Office of Inspector General in the Department of Justice (DOJ) must conduct annual audits of selected grant recipients. DOJ must submit an annual certification to Congress and identify and report on duplicative grant awards. (Sec. 3) The bill expresses the sense of Congress that the use of best practices is encouraged for activities carried out with JABG funds. (Sec. 4) It amends the Justice Assistance Act of 1984 to eliminate existing authority for DOJ to award grants under the Emergency Federal Law Enforcement Assistance Program through FY2023.
Title
Tiffany Joslyn Juvenile Accountability Block Grant Program Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2018-09-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | H.Amdt.977 On agreeing to the Marino amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-28 | House | H.Amdt.977 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Marino. (consideration: CR H9391-9392; text: CR H9391-9392) |
2018-09-28 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9390-9392; text of measure as introduced: CR H9391) |
2018-09-28 | House | Mr. Marino asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-28 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government studies and investigations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Government studies and investigations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding