US HB6746 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting American Taxpayers and Homeowners Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting American Taxpayers and Homeowners Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-09-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1153 (Related) 2018-02-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB4545 (Related) 2018-03-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2237 (Related) 2017-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback