US HB6729 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Empowering Financial Institutions to Fight Human Trafficking Act of 2018 (Sec. 2) This bill allows a qualified nonprofit organization to share information with financial institutions and other authorities regarding possible human trafficking or related money laundering activities. The Department of the Treasury must determine which financial institutions are eligible to receive this information. Nonprofit organizations, financial institutions, and other authorities shall not be held liable for sharing this information in compliance with specified regulations.
Title
Empowering Financial Institutions to Fight Human Trafficking Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 408 (Y: 297 N: 124 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2018-09-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 297 - 124 (Roll no. 408). (text: CR H9052-9053) |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9059) |
2018-09-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-09-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6729. |
2018-09-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9052-9056) |
2018-09-26 | House | Mr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-09-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 766. |
2018-09-26 | House | Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-981. |
2018-09-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 44 - 5. |
2018-09-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-09-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Finance and financial sector
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Licensing and registrations
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of the Treasury
Finance and financial sector
Foreign and international banking
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Human trafficking
Licensing and registrations
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations