US HB6725 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-11)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To change the address of the Marilyn Monroe Post Office, and for other purposes.
Title
To change the address of the Marilyn Monroe Post Office, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-14 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 1518, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1082, as amended; H.R. 5349; H.R. 6218; H.R. 6220; H.R. 6221; H.R. 6611, as amended; H.R. 6630; H.R. 6725; H.R. 7077, agreed to Senate amendment; H.R. 7832; H.R. 8665; S. 558; and S. 789. S. 558; and S. 789. (consideration: CR H9803-9810; text: CR H9805) |
2022-12-14 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1518, proceedings on H.R. 6725 are considered vacated. |
2022-12-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6725. |
2022-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9662-9663; text: CR H9662) |
2022-12-12 | House | Mrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-11-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-11-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1518 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.