US HB672 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Combating European Anti-Semitism Act of 2017 (Sec. 3) This bill expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) it is in the U.S. national interest to combat anti-Semitism at home and abroad; (2) there is a need to ensure the security of European Jewish communities, including synagogues, schools, and cemeteries; (3) the United States should continue to emphasize the importance of combating anti-Semitism in multilateral bodies; and (4) the Department of State should continue to document acts of anti-Semitism and anti-Semitic incitement and encourage adoption by national government institutions and multilateral institutions of a working definition of anti-Semitism similar to the one adopted in the International Holocaust Remembrance Alliance context. (Sec. 4) The International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 is amended to require the State Department's Annual Report on International Religious Freedom to include, for each European country in which threats or attacks against Jewish persons, schools, and religious institutions are particularly significant, a description of: the security challenges and needs of European Jewish communities and European law enforcement agencies; U.S. efforts to partner with European law enforcement agencies and civil society groups to combat anti-Semitic incidents; educational programming and public awareness initiatives that impart values of pluralism and tolerance, showcase the positive contributions of Jews, and pay special attention to population segments that exhibit a high degree of anti-Semitic animus; and efforts by European governments to adopt and apply a working definition of anti-Semitism.
Title
Combating European Anti-Semitism Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] |
Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8041) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4275-4276) |
2017-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 672. |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4275-4278) |
2017-05-17 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB198 (Same As) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Educational facilities and institutions
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Educational facilities and institutions
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Teaching, teachers, curricula