US HB670 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on January 4 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-04 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Passed on January 4 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-04 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title IV of the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to establish a clearinghouse on intellectual disabilities, and for other purposes.
Title
Think Differently Database Act
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Nicholas Langworthy [R-NY] | Rep. Erin Houchin [R-IN] | Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Greg Landsman [D-OH] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Sen. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Brandon Williams [R-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2024-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2024-12-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7316) |
2024-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2024-12-17 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2024-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7277) |
2024-12-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 670. |
2024-12-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7277-7278) |
2024-12-17 | House | Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 714. |
2024-12-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-874. |
2024-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 0. |
2024-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 0. |
2024-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4174 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.