US HB670 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Puerto Rico Medicare Part B Equity Act of 2013 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to repeal the exclusion of residents of Puerto Rico from deemed enrollment under part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance Benefits) and thus apply it to them. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to provide for a special seven-month enrollment period for such residents. Requires recalculation of the late enrollment penalty to 15% of the usual penalty for residents of Puerto Rico who are current enrollees or who enroll during a specified transition period.
Title
Puerto Rico Medicare Part B Equity Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] |
Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2013-02-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H461-462) |
Same As/Similar To
SB324 (Same As) 2013-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/670/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr670/BILLS-113hr670ih.pdf |