US HB6687 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to manage the Point Reyes National Seashore in the State of California consistent with Congress' longstanding intent to maintain working dairies and ranches on agricultural property as part of the seashore's unique historic, cultural, scenic and natural values, and for other purposes.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to manage the Point Reyes National Seashore in the State of California consistent with Congress' longstanding intent to maintain working dairies and ranches on agricultural property as part of the seashore's unique historic, cultural, scenic and natural values, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8857) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6687. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8856-8858) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 756. |
2018-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-968. |
2018-09-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-08-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-08-28 | House | Introduced in House |