US HB6685 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waives, upon state request, specified matching and reporting requirements for family violence and prevention services grants to states, subgrants to local entities, and grants to tribal organizations. This applies to grants awarded during FY2019-FY2020 and the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) public health emergency.
Title
POWER Act Protect Our Women and Waive Emergency Requirements Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3739 (Related) 2020-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3739 (Related) 2020-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Families
Family services
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Families
Family services
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/6685/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr6685/BILLS-116hr6685ih.pdf |