US HB6674 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicare Crisis Program Act of 2020 This bill makes a series of changes to health insurance coverage and requirements during the public health emergency relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). For example, the bill makes several changes to Medicare and Medicare Advantage (MA) during the public health emergency. Among other things, the bill allows all individuals who receive unemployment benefits, and their dependents, to enroll in Medicare if they otherwise do not have health insurance coverage; eliminates cost-sharing for COVID-19 drugs and treatment services under Medicare and MA; eliminates premiums under Medicare and caps overall cost-sharing under Medicare and MA; and establishes a national clearinghouse for the purchase and distribution of COVID-19 personal protective equipment for Medicare providers. The bill also alters requirements under Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) and for private health insurers during the emergency. Among other things, the bill requires coverage of COVID-19 vaccines and treatment services under Medicaid and CHIP without cost-sharing; increases the Medicaid Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (FMAP) that is otherwise applicable during the public health emergency, including for states experiencing economic downturns (i.e., high unemployment); requires private health insurers to cover COVID-19 treatment services without cost-sharing; and requires federal payment to health care providers for the cost of COVID-19 treatment services that are provided to uninsured individuals, based on Medicare payment rates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare Crisis Program Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-05-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-05-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-05-01HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-05-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB6511 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6539 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6640 (Related) 2020-04-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6727 (Related) 2020-05-05 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6739 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback